FL H0267 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-01 - Chapter No. 2013-241
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-01 - Chapter No. 2013-241
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Deletes requirement that blank spaces be included on warranty deed to allow for entry of social security numbers of grantees on deed; provides that certain types of governmental or quasi-governmental liens on real property are valid & effectual against certain creditors or purchasers only if recorded in specified manner.
Title
Real Property Liens and Conveyances
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#40 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#249 (Y: 112 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#249 (Y: 112 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-01 | Chapter No. 2013-241 | |
2013-06-28 | Approved by Governor | |
2013-06-17 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2013-04-29 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2013-04-26 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Substituted for CS/SB 404 |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Withdrawn from Judiciary; Community Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax; Appropriations |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Received |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Community Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax; Appropriations |
2013-04-24 | Senate | In Messages |
2013-04-24 | House | CS passed; YEAS 112 NAYS 3 |
2013-04-24 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-23 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2013-04-23 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-19 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/23/13 |
2013-03-20 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2013-03-20 | House | Favorable by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 |
2013-03-18 | House | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 03/20/13, 8:00 am, 404 HOB |
2013-03-12 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2013-03-11 | House | CS by Local and Federal Affairs Committee read 1st time |
2013-03-11 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2013-03-07 | House | CS by Local and Federal Affairs Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 |
2013-03-05 | House | On Committee agenda-- Local and Federal Affairs Committee, 03/07/13, 4:00 pm, Webster Hall |
2013-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2013-02-13 | House | Now in Local and Federal Affairs Committee |
2013-02-13 | House | Favorable by Civil Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2013-02-06 | House | On Committee agenda-- Civil Justice Subcommittee, 02/13/13, 2:00 pm, 404 HOB |
2013-01-30 | House | Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; Local and Federal Affairs Committee; Judiciary Committee |
2013-01-17 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0404 (Same As) 2013-04-25 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 267 (Ch. 2013-241)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
689 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
695 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |