FL H0265 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Introduced on October 1 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-10-22 - Placed on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Reclassifies criminal offense for specified violation; requires physician to obtain notarized written consent of parent or legal guardian before inducing or performing termination of pregnancy of minor; provides exceptions to consent requirement; provides criminal penalties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Abortion

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-22HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-10-22HouseFavorable by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 12 NAYS 6
2019-10-15HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 10/22/19, 1:00 pm, Morris Hall
2019-10-10HouseReferred to Health and Human Services Committee
2019-10-01HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

H267 (Related) 2019-10-22 - Placed on Calendar
S404 (Similar To) 2019-11-05 - On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 11/12/19, 10:30 am, 412 Knott Building --Amendment(s) Adopted - Temporarily Postponed

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
27511Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3900111Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39001114Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback