FL H0265 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Requires court considering whether to release defendant on bail to determine whether defendant is subject to registration as sexual offender or predator &, if so, to hold defendant without bail until first appearance on case; provides exception.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sexual Offenders and Predators

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-04-29 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#383 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-07 Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2011-04-29 In Messages
2011-04-29 Read 2nd time -HJ 905
2011-04-27 Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/29/11
2011-04-18 Placed on Calendar -HJ 671
2011-04-15 Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c)
2011-04-14 CS by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 -HJ 659
2011-04-12 On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 04/14/11, 9:00 am, 404 HOB
2011-03-24 Now in Judiciary Committee -HJ 313
2011-03-16 Favorable by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 -HJ 313
2011-03-14 On Committee agenda-- Justice Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/16/11, 8:00 am, Morris Hall
2011-03-08 Introduced -HJ 28
2011-02-22 Favorable by Criminal Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 1 -HJ 151
2011-02-15 On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice Subcommittee, 02/22/11, 9:00 am, 404 HOB
2011-02-01 Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee -HJ 28
2011-01-19 Filed

Same As/Similar To

S0494 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
903046Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback