FL H0263 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on October 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-03 - Laid on Table, refer to SB 352
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-03 - Laid on Table, refer to SB 352
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires applicant to file certain information with issuing authority if direct contract is greater than specified amount; exempts specified direct contracts from certain notice of commencement requirements.
Title
Notice of Commencement Requirements
Sponsors
House Judiciary Committee | House Regulatory Reform Subcommittee | Rep. Melony Bell [R] | Rep. Christopher Benjamin [D] |
Rep. Stan McClain [R] | Rep. Daisy Morales [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-01-20 - House - House Judiciary Committee (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-12 - House - House Regulatory Reform Subcommittee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-12-01 - House - House Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-12 - House - House Regulatory Reform Subcommittee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-12-01 - House - House Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-03 | House | Laid on Table, refer to SB 352 |
2022-03-03 | House | Substituted SB 352 |
2022-02-28 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/3/2022) |
2022-01-21 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2022-01-21 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2022-01-20 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2) |
2022-01-20 | House | CS Filed |
2022-01-20 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2022-01-20 | House | Reported out of Judiciary Committee |
2022-01-20 | House | Favorable with CS by Judiciary Committee |
2022-01-18 | House | Added to Judiciary Committee agenda |
2022-01-14 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2022-01-14 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2022-01-13 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2022-01-13 | House | CS Filed |
2022-01-13 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2022-01-13 | House | Reported out of Regulatory Reform Subcommittee |
2022-01-13 | House | Favorable with CS by Regulatory Reform Subcommittee |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2022-01-10 | House | Added to Regulatory Reform Subcommittee agenda |
2021-12-01 | House | Now in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee |
2021-12-01 | House | Reported out of Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee |
2021-12-01 | House | Favorable by Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee |
2021-11-23 | House | Added to Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee agenda |
2021-10-22 | House | Now in Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee |
2021-10-22 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2021-10-22 | House | Referred to Regulatory Reform Subcommittee |
2021-10-22 | House | Referred to Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee |
2021-10-12 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S352 (Similar To) 2022-05-19 - Chapter No. 2022-120