FL H0257 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Health Quality Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Health Quality Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires DOH to issue noncertified copy of original birth certificate to certain adoptees under certain conditions; provides for fee.
Title
Adoptee Birth Certificates
Sponsors
Rep. Richard Stark [D] | Rep. Robert Asencio [D] | Sen. Lori Berman [D] | Rep. John Cortes [D] |
Rep. Emily Slosberg-King [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | House | Died in Health Quality Subcommittee |
2017-05-05 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced |
2017-01-25 | House | Referred to Health Quality Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2017-01-17 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0434 (Same As) 2017-05-05 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/257 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/0257/BillText/Filed/PDF |