FL H0255 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires OPPAGA to collect specified information & prepare report on sentences imposed by each circuit & county court judge in criminal & juvenile cases; specifies required contents of report; requires office to post report on its website; requires disqualification of judge under specified circumstances; specifies entities to whom report must be provided.
Title
Judicial Accountability
Sponsors
Rep. Kionne McGhee [D] | Rep. Larry Lee [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | House | Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2017-05-05 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced |
2017-01-25 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Public Integrity and Ethics Committee; Judiciary Committee |
2017-01-17 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0382 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Criminal Justice
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/255 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/0255/BillText/Filed/PDF |