FL H0255 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes community college boards of trustees to establish transportation access fee; limits amount of fee; provides timeframe for fee increase & implementation of increase; prohibits inclusion of fee in calculating amount student receives under Florida Bright Futures Scholarship Program awards.
Title
Community College Student Fees
Sponsors
Rep. Ronald Brise [D] | Rep. Charles Chestnut [D] | Rep. Hazelle Rogers [D] | Sen. Darren Soto [D] |
Rep. John Tobia [R] | Rep. Juan Zapata [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-03-24 - House - House Roll Call No. 0618 - Passage (Y: 93 N: 17 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Messages | |
2010-03-31 | In Messages | |
2010-03-24 | Read 3rd time -HJ 00387; Passed; YEAS 93 NAYS 17 -HJ 00387 | |
2010-03-23 | Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -HJ 00368 | |
2010-03-17 | Favorable by- Education Policy Council; YEAS 14 NAYS 2 -HJ 00312; Placed on Calendar -HJ 00312 | |
2010-03-15 | On Council agenda-- Education Policy Council, 03/17/10, 8:30 am, Morris Hall | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to State Universities & Private Colleges Policy (EPC); State Universities & Private Colleges Appropriations (CEED); Education Policy Council -HJ 00029; On Committee agenda-- State Universities & Private Colleges Policy (EPC), 01/13/10, 9:00 am, Reed Hall; Favorable by State Universities & Private Colleges Policy (EPC); YEAS 11 NAYS 1 -HJ 00165; Now in State Universities & Private Colleges Appropriations (CEED) -HJ 00165; On Committee agenda-- State Universities & Private Colleges Appropriations (CEED), 02/09/10, 1:00 pm, 12-H; Favorable by State Universities & Private Colleges Appropriations (CEED); YEAS 10 NAYS 4 -HJ 00169; Now in Education Policy Council -HJ 00170 | |
2010-02-18 | Now in Education Policy Council | |
2010-02-09 | Favorable by State Universities & Private Colleges Appropriations (CEED); YEAS 10 NAYS 4 | |
2010-02-02 | On Committee agenda-- State Universities & Private Colleges Appropriations (CEED), 02/09/10, 1:00 pm, 12-H | |
2010-01-14 | Now in State Universities & Private Colleges Appropriations (CEED) | |
2010-01-13 | Favorable by State Universities & Private Colleges Policy (EPC); YEAS 11 NAYS 1 | |
2010-01-06 | On Committee agenda-- State Universities & Private Colleges Policy (EPC), 01/13/10, 9:00 am, Reed Hall | |
2009-11-13 | Referred to State Universities & Private Colleges Policy (EPC); State Universities & Private Colleges Appropriations (CEED); Education Policy Council | |
2009-10-21 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0208 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died on Calendar