FL H0253 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-01 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 180 (Ch. 2023-205)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-01 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 180 (Ch. 2023-205)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Revises requirements for registration of securities; requires OFR to deem applications for registration abandoned under certain circumstances; revises grounds on which office may revoke, suspend, or deny registration of securities; specifies office's powers in investigations of issuers; revises methods by which office may enter order suspending issuer's right to sell securities; revises requirements for applying for registration as dealer, associated person of dealer, or investment adviser; provides registration exemptions for private fund advisers; specifies continuing education requirements for associated persons of investment advisers & federal covered advisers; specifies requirements for certain previously registered associated persons; authorizes FSC to establish rules of conduct & prohibited business practices for intermediaries.
Title
Regulation of Securities
Sponsors
House Commerce Committee | House Insurance & Banking Subcommittee | Rep. Webster Barnaby [R] | Rep. Christopher Benjamin [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-10 - House - House Commerce Committee (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-04-10 - House - House Commerce Committee (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - House - House Insurance & Banking Subcommittee (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-10 - House - House Commerce Committee (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - House - House Insurance & Banking Subcommittee (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-01 | House | Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 180 (Ch. 2023-205) |
2023-04-13 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2023-04-13 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2023-04-12 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2) |
2023-04-12 | House | CS Filed |
2023-04-12 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2023-04-12 | House | Reported out of Commerce Committee |
2023-04-11 | House | Favorable with CS by Commerce Committee (Amended) |
2023-04-06 | House | Added to Commerce Committee agenda |
2023-03-24 | House | Now in Commerce Committee |
2023-03-24 | House | Referred to Commerce Committee |
2023-03-24 | House | Original reference removed: State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee |
2023-03-23 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2023-03-23 | House | CS Filed |
2023-03-23 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2023-03-23 | House | Reported out of Insurance & Banking Subcommittee |
2023-03-21 | House | Favorable with CS by Insurance & Banking Subcommittee |
2023-03-17 | House | PCS added to Insurance & Banking Subcommittee agenda |
2023-03-07 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2023-01-25 | House | Now in Insurance & Banking Subcommittee |
2023-01-25 | House | Referred to Commerce Committee |
2023-01-25 | House | Referred to State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee |
2023-01-25 | House | Referred to Insurance & Banking Subcommittee |
2023-01-18 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S180 (Similar To) 2023-06-13 - Chapter No. 2023-205
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
517 | 021 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
517 | 061 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
517 | 0611 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
517 | 072 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
517 | 075 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
517 | 081 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
517 | 082 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
517 | 111 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
517 | 12 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
517 | 1205 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
517 | 1214 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
517 | 1215 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
517 | 1217 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
517 | 131 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
517 | 161 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
517 | 181 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
517 | 201 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
517 | 211 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
517 | 315 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 9911 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
744 | 351 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
921 | 0022 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |