FL H0253 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Introduced on September 30 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-21 - Placed on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes state attorney, or his or her designee, to initiate elder abuse fatality review team in his or her judicial circuit to review deaths of elderly persons; provides for membership, operations, meetings, & duties of review teams; provides reporting requirements; provides immunity from monetary liability under certain conditions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Elder Abuse Fatality Review Teams

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-21HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-20HouseCS/CS by Health and Human Services Committee read 1st time
2020-02-20HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2020-02-18HouseCS/CS by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
2020-02-14HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 02/18/20, 3:00 pm, Morris Hall
2020-01-22HouseNow in Health and Human Services Committee
2020-01-22HouseFavorable by Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
2020-01-17HouseOn Committee agenda-- Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee, 01/22/20, 8:30 am, Morris Hall
2020-01-14HouseCS by Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee read 1st time
2020-01-14HouseIntroduced
2019-11-13HouseNow in Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee
2019-11-08HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-11-07HouseCS by Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0
2019-10-31HouseOn Committee agenda-- Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee, 11/07/19, 9:00 am, 12 HOB
2019-10-10HouseReferred to Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee; Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee
2019-09-30HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S400 (Same As) 2020-02-04 - In Messages

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4151103Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback