FL H0253 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-4-1)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes Independent Living Task Force within Florida Housing Finance Corporation; provides for duties, membership, & meetings of task force; requires task force to submit report to Governor & Legislature by specified date; provides for expiration.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Independent Living Task Force

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-29 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#274 (Y: 112 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-04-29SenateReceived
2019-04-29SenateReferred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
2019-04-29SenateIn Messages
2019-04-29HouseCS passed; YEAS 112 NAYS 1
2019-04-29HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-26HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-04-26HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-24HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/26/19
2019-04-18HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-04-18HouseFavorable by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 22 NAYS 0
2019-04-16HouseOn Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 04/18/19, 8:00 am, Morris Hall
2019-03-22HouseNow in State Affairs Committee
2019-03-22HouseCS referred to State Affairs Committee
2019-03-22HouseOriginal reference(s) removed: Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee
2019-03-21HouseCS by Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee read 1st time
2019-03-21HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-03-20HouseCS by Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0
2019-03-18HouseOn Committee agenda-- Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee, 03/20/19, 9:00 am, 12 HOB
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-01-23HouseReferred to Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee; Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee
2019-01-11HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S670 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Rules

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
39325Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4205075Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback