FL H0249 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits certain members of Special Risk Class from being reemployed or contracting with same employing agency from which member retired; extends period of time during which certain Special Risk Class members may participate in FRS DROP, etc.
Title
Special Risk Class Retirement Benefits
Sponsors
Rep. Paige Kreegel [R] | Rep. Ari Porth [D] | Rep. Michelle Rehwinkel Vasilinda [D] | Sen. Darryl Rouson [D] |
Rep. William Snyder [R] | Rep. John Tobia [R] | Rep. Charles Van Zant [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Committee on Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA) | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA); Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA); Government Operations Appropriations (CGHC); Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council -HJ 00028 | |
2009-11-13 | Referred to Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA); Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA); Government Operations Appropriations (CGHC); Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council | |
2009-10-20 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0612 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means