FL H0243 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in Education Quality Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in Education Quality Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires school districts, upon request of student or his or her parent or guardian, to provide certain alternative meals & snacks to students; provides cost requirements for such meals & snacks; authorizes such request to be made at beginning of each semester; & provides school district requirements.
Title
School Nutrition Program Requirements
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-05 | House | Died in Education Quality Subcommittee |
2023-03-07 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2023-01-25 | House | Now in Education Quality Subcommittee |
2023-01-25 | House | Referred to Education & Employment Committee |
2023-01-25 | House | Referred to PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee |
2023-01-25 | House | Referred to Education Quality Subcommittee |
2023-01-18 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1376 (Similar To) 2023-05-05 - Died in Education Pre-K -12
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/243 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/243/BillText/Filed/PDF |