FL H0243 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that operation & maintenance of projects, activities, & products by Lee Memorial Health System Board of Directors are deemed public purpose; authorizes board to establish, fund, support, organize, & participate in such projects, activities, & products; provides for quorum; revises provisions relating to powers of board & funds; provides powers of Lee Memorial Health System; exempts from taxes certain notes, mortgages, security agreements, letters of credit, or other instruments; revises ways funds of board may be paid out; authorizes board to invest specified funds.
Title
Lee Memorial Health System, Lee County
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | House | Died in Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-01-22 | House | Referred to Local Administration and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee; Ways and Means Committee; State Affairs Committee |
2021-01-13 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/243 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/243/BillText/Filed/PDF |