FL H0241 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Proposes amendment of s. 24, Art. I & ss. 4, 7, & 19, Art. III of State Constitution to provide that 2/3 vote of membership of each house is required to enact public records or public meeting exemptions, authorize challenges in circuit court to reasonableness or interpretation of legislative rules governing public access to legislative documents & meetings, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Expanding Public's Access/Legislative Process

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-04-30 Died in Committee on Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA)
2010-03-02 Introduced, referred to Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA); Rules and Calendar Council; Full Appropriations Council on Education & Economic Development; Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council -HJ 00028
2009-11-01 Referred to Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA); Rules and Calendar Council; Full Appropriations Council on Education & Economic Development; Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council
2009-10-16 Filed

Same As/Similar To

S0440 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Ethics and Elections

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
00124Amended CodeSee Bill Text
00304New CodeSee Bill Text
00307New CodeSee Bill Text
00319New CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback