FL H0237 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-7)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits performance of advanced well stimulation treatments; provides that permits for drilling or operating wells do not authorize performance of advanced well treatments; provides applicability.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Advanced Well Stimulation Treatment

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10HouseDied in Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
2018-03-10HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2017-10-12HouseReferred to Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; Natural Resources and Public Lands Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee
2017-10-05HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S462 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations
S834 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Environmental Preservation and Conservation

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
37719Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3772405Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback