FL H0235 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA), companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 814 (Ch. 2010-190)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA), companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 814 (Ch. 2010-190)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes commercial mobile radio service provider to offer Lifeline services; authorizes DCFS, DOE, PSC, & Office of Public Counsel to exchange information with telecommunications carriers & mobile radio service providers so carriers & providers can identify & enroll eligible person in Lifeline & Link-Up programs; requires PSC, DCFS, Office of Public Counsel, & each eligible telecommunications carrier to convene Lifeline Workgroup.
Title
Lifeline Telecommunications Service
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Committee on Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA), companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 814 (Ch. 2010-190) | |
2010-03-23 | Now in Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA) -HJ 00378 | |
2010-03-22 | CS read 1st time on 03/22/10 -HJ 00354; Pending review of CS under Rule 7.20 | |
2010-03-17 | CS by Energy & Utilities Policy (GGPC); YEAS 13 NAYS 0 -HJ 00359 | |
2010-03-15 | On Committee agenda-- Energy & Utilities Policy (GGPC), 03/17/10, 2:15 pm, Morris Hall | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Energy & Utilities Policy (GGPC); Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA); General Government Policy Council -HJ 00027 | |
2009-11-01 | Referred to Energy & Utilities Policy (GGPC); Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA); General Government Policy Council | |
2009-10-15 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0814 (Similar To) 2010-06-03 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-190