FL H0229 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Placed on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Proposing amendments to the State Constitution to limit the terms of office for a member of a district school board.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Limitation on Terms of Office for Members of a District School Board

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-28HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-03-28HouseFavorable by- Education Committee; YEAS 14 NAYS 3
2019-03-26HouseOn Committee agenda-- Education Committee, 03/28/19, 8:30 am, Reed Hall
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-02-20HouseNow in Education Committee
2019-02-20HouseFavorable by Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 4
2019-02-13HouseOn Committee agenda-- Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee, 02/20/19, 9:00 am, Morris Hall
2019-02-06HouseNow in Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee
2019-02-06HouseFavorable by PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0
2019-01-30HouseOn Committee agenda-- PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee, 02/06/19, 10:30 am, Reed Hall
2019-01-16HouseReferred to PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee; Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee; Education Committee
2019-01-10HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S274 (Same As) 2019-04-17 - On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/17/19, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Building --Temporarily Postponed

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback