FL H0229 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Finance and Tax Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Finance and Tax Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Proposes amendment to State Constitution to allow Legislature, by general law after specified date, to exempt from taxation property owned by municipality that is not used for municipal or public purposes.
Title
Municipal Property Tax Exemption
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-28 | House | Died in Finance and Tax Committee |
2015-03-03 | House | Introduced |
2015-01-22 | House | Referred to Finance and Tax Committee; Local Government Affairs Subcommittee; Local and Federal Affairs Committee |
2015-01-12 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0588 (Same As) 2015-05-01 - Died in Community Affairs
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/229 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0229/BillText/Filed/PDF |