FL H0229 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-01 - Chapter No. 2013-240
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-01 - Chapter No. 2013-240
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Providing requirements relating to vesting of ownership in trustee; revises rights, liabilities, & duties of land trust beneficiaries; provides exclusion & applicability; revises provisions relating to land trust transfers of real property & vesting of ownership in trustee; prohibits operation of statute of uses & doctrine of merger to execute land trust or to vest trust property under certain conditions; provides conditions under which beneficial interest is deemed real property; authorizes certain beneficial ownership methods; provides for perfection of security documents; provides that trustee's legal & equitable title to trust property is separate & distinct from beneficiary's beneficial interest in land trust & trust property; prohibits lien, judgment, mortgage, security interest or other encumbrance against one interest from automatically attaching to another interest; provides that appointment of guardian ad litem is not necessary in certain foreclosure litigation affecting title to trust property of land trust; provides for determination of applicable law for certain trusts; provides applicability relating to UCC financing statements; provides requirements for recording effectiveness; revises & provides scope of Florida Trust Code.
Title
Land Trusts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#34 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#207 (Y: 114 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#207 (Y: 114 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-01 | Chapter No. 2013-240 | |
2013-06-28 | Approved by Governor | |
2013-06-17 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2013-04-29 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2013-04-26 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 34 NAYS 0 |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Substituted for CS/SB 1172 |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Withdrawn from Judiciary; Banking and Insurance; Rules |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Received |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Banking and Insurance; Rules |
2013-04-24 | Senate | In Messages |
2013-04-24 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 114 NAYS 1 |
2013-04-24 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-24 | House | Amendment(s) adopted (506909) |
2013-04-24 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-22 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/24/13 |
2013-03-25 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2013-03-22 | House | CS/CS by Judiciary Committee read 1st time |
2013-03-22 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c) |
2013-03-20 | House | CS/CS by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 |
2013-03-18 | House | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 03/20/13, 8:00 am, 404 HOB |
2013-03-11 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2013-03-06 | House | Favorable by Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2013-03-05 | House | CS by Civil Justice Subcommittee read 1st time |
2013-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2013-03-04 | House | On Committee agenda-- Insurance and Banking Subcommittee, 03/06/13, 1:00 pm, 404 HOB |
2013-02-21 | House | Now in Insurance and Banking Subcommittee |
2013-02-19 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2013-02-13 | House | CS by Civil Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2013-02-06 | House | On Committee agenda-- Civil Justice Subcommittee, 02/13/13, 2:00 pm, 404 HOB |
2013-01-30 | House | Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2013-01-17 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1172 (Similar To) 2013-04-25 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 229 (Ch. 2013-240)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
689 | 071 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
689 | 073 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
736 | 0102 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |