FL H0227 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on October 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-05 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/SB 376
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Provides that first responders are entitled to workers' compensation benefits for posttraumatic stress disorder in specified circumstances; provides standard of proof of such disorder & requirements relating to such benefits; provides time for notice of injury or death; requires employing agency to provide mental health training; provides declaration of important state interest.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Workers' Compensation Benefits for First Responders

Sponsors

House of Delegates Government Accountability Committee CommitteeHouse of Delegates Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee CommitteeHouse of Delegates Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee CommitteeRep. Matt Willhite [D]
Rep. Rene Plasencia [R]Rep. Joseph Abruzzo [D]Rep. Ben Albritton [R]Rep. Ramon Alexander [D]
Rep. Thad Altman [R]Rep. Bruce Antone [D]Rep. Robert Asencio [D]Rep. Bryan Avila [R]
Rep. Lori Berman [D]Rep. Kamia Brown [D]Rep. Daniel Burgess [R]Rep. Colleen Burton [R]
Rep. Cord Byrd [R]Rep. Matthew Caldwell [R]Rep. Chuck Clemons [R]Rep. John Cortes [D]
Rep. Janet Cruz [D]Rep. Kimberly Daniels [D]Rep. Tracie Davis [D]Rep. Ben Diamond [D]
Rep. Byron Donalds [R]Rep. Brad Drake [R]Rep. Nicholas Duran [D]Rep. Katie Edwards [D]
Rep. Randy Fine [R]Rep. Jason Fischer [R]Rep. Heather Fitzenhagen [R]Rep. Joseph Geller [D]
Rep. Julio Gonzalez [R]Rep. Margaret Good [D]Rep. James Grant [R]Rep. Michael Grant [R]
Rep. Joe Gruters [R]Rep. Roy Hardemon [D]Rep. Shawn Harrison [R]Rep. Blaise Ingoglia [R]
Rep. Kristin Jacobs [D]Rep. Evan Jenne [D]Rep. Shevrin Jones [D]Rep. Sam Killebrew [R]
Rep. Chris Latvala [R]Rep. Larry Lee [D]Rep. Tom Leek [R]Rep. MaryLynn Magar [R]
Rep. Amber Mariano [R]Rep. Ralph Massullo [R]Rep. Lawrence Mcclure [R]Rep. Kionne McGhee [D]
Rep. Amy Mercado [D]Rep. Larry Metz [R]Rep. Mike Miller [R]Rep. George Moraitis [R]
Rep. Jared Moskowitz [D]Rep. Wengay Newton [D]Rep. Jeanette Nunez [R]Rep. Robert Olszewski [R]
Rep. Bobby Payne [R]Rep. Kathleen Peters [R]Rep. Cary Pigman [R]Rep. Scott Plakon [R]
Rep. Mel Ponder [R]Rep. Sharon Pritchett [D]Rep. Holly Raschein [R]Rep. David Richardson [D]
Rep. Barrington Russell [D]Rep. Sean Shaw [D]Rep. David Silvers [D]Rep. Irving Slosberg [D]
Rep. Carlos Smith [D]Rep. Richard Stark [D]Rep. Charlie Stone [R]Rep. Jennifer Sullivan [R]
Rep. Jackie Toledo [R]Rep. Barbara Watson [D]Rep. Clovis Watson [D]Rep. Patricia Hawkins-Williams [D]
Rep. Jayer Williamson [R]Rep. Clay Yarborough [R]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-05HouseLaid on Table, refer to CS/CS/SB 376
2018-03-05HouseSubstituted CS/CS/SB 376
2018-03-02HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-03-02HouseRead 2nd time
2018-02-27HouseCS/CS/CS by Government Accountability Committee read 1st time 686
2018-02-27HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/02/18
2018-02-27HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-02-27HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2018-02-26HouseCS/CS/CS by- Government Accountability Committee; YEAS 19 NAYS 0
2018-02-25HouseOn Committee agenda-- Government Accountability Committee, 02/26/18, 2:00 pm, Morris Hall
2018-02-19HouseNow in Government Accountability Committee
2018-02-16HouseCS/CS by Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee read 1st time 603
2018-02-16HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2018-02-13HouseCS/CS by Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
2018-02-09HouseOn Committee agenda-- Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee, 02/13/18, 9:30 am, Morris Hall
2018-02-05HouseNow in Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
2018-01-31HouseCS by Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee read 1st time
2018-01-31HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2018-01-30HouseCS by Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
2018-01-26HouseOn Committee agenda-- Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee, 01/30/18, 8:30 am, Morris Hall
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2017-10-12HouseReferred to Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee; Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee; Government Accountability Committee
2017-10-03HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S376 (Same As) 2018-03-28 - Chapter No. 2018-124
S126 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Banking and Insurance
H629 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1121815Amended CodeSee Bill Text
440093Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback