FL H0223 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-09-23 - Withdrawn prior to introduction, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 249 (Ch. 2016-120)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for applicability of DOH sanitation rules to licensed culinary education program; permits culinary education program with food service establishment license to obtain alcoholic beverage license under certain conditions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Culinary Education Programs

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-09-23HouseWithdrawn prior to introduction, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 249 (Ch. 2016-120)
2015-09-22HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S0706 (Similar To) 2016-03-09 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 249 (Ch. 2016-120)
H0249 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Chapter No. 2016-120

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3810072Amended CodeSee Bill Text
509013Amended CodeSee Bill Text
56120Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback