FL H0223 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Provides exemption from public records requirements for identifying information of applicant for president or provost of state university or Florida College System institution; provides exemption from public meetings requirements for any portion of meeting that is held for purpose of identifying or vetting, or which would otherwise disclose identifying information of, potential applicants for president or provost; provides for future legislative review & repeal of exemptions; provides statement of public necessity.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Records and Meetings/Postsecondary Education Executive Search

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-28HouseDied on Calendar
2015-04-01HousePlaced on Calendar
2015-04-01HouseFavorable by- Education Committee; YEAS 12 NAYS 6
2015-03-30HouseOn Committee agenda-- Education Committee, 04/01/15, 8:30 am, Reed Hall
2015-03-26HouseNow in Education Committee
2015-03-25HouseCS/CS by Government Operations Subcommittee read 1st time
2015-03-24HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c)
2015-03-24HouseCS/CS by Government Operations Subcommittee; YEAS 8 NAYS 4
2015-03-20HouseOn Committee agenda-- Government Operations Subcommittee, 03/24/15, 8:00 am, Webster Hall
2015-03-11HouseNow in Government Operations Subcommittee
2015-03-10HouseCS by Higher Education and Workforce Subcommittee read 1st time
2015-03-10HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c)
2015-03-10HouseCS by Higher Education and Workforce Subcommittee; YEAS 9 NAYS 1
2015-03-06HouseOn Committee agenda-- Higher Education and Workforce Subcommittee, 03/10/15, 9:00 am, Reed Hall
2015-03-03HouseIntroduced
2015-01-22HouseReferred to Higher Education and Workforce Subcommittee; Government Operations Subcommittee; Education Committee
2015-01-09HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S0182 (Same As) 2015-05-01 - Died in Rules

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1004097Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback