FL H0223 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on October 25 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-26 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 404 (Ch. 2014-73)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for apportionment of licensure examination fee; revises licensure examination requirements for professional geologists; provides requirements for registration as geologist-in-training; provides requirements for geologist-in-training applicants to take discrete part of licensure examination; requires DBPR to register each geologist-in-training applicant who passes fundamentals of geology part of licensure examination; exempts registered geologists-in-training seeking licensure as professional geologist from retaking fundamentals of geology part of licensure examination.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Professional Geology

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-26HouseLaid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 404 (Ch. 2014-73)
2014-03-26HouseSubstituted CS/CS/SB 404
2014-03-24HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/26/14
2014-03-20HousePlaced on Calendar
2014-03-20HouseFavorable by- Regulatory Affairs Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
2014-03-18HouseOn Committee agenda-- Regulatory Affairs Committee, 03/20/14, 9:00 am, Sumner Hall
2014-03-10HouseCS/CS by Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee read 1st time
2014-03-10HouseNow in Regulatory Affairs Committee
2014-03-07HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c)
2014-03-04HouseCS by Business and Professional Regulation Subcommittee read 1st time
2014-03-04HouseCS/CS by Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
2014-03-04HouseIntroduced
2014-02-28HouseOn Committee agenda-- Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/04/14, 1:30 pm, Morris Hall
2014-02-10HouseNow in Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee
2014-02-06HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c)
2014-02-04HouseCS by Business and Professional Regulation Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
2014-01-28HousePCS on Committee agenda-- Business and Professional Regulation Subcommittee, 02/04/14, 1:30 pm, 12 HOB
2013-11-22HouseReferred to Business and Professional Regulation Subcommittee; Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee; Regulatory Affairs Committee
2013-10-25HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S0404 (Similar To) 2014-06-13 - Chapter No. 2014-73

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
492104Amended CodeSee Bill Text
492105Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4921051Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback