FL H0219 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Requires advertising platforms to collect & remit specified taxes imposed for certain transactions; preempts regulation of vacation rentals to state; prohibits local law, ordinance, or regulation from allowing or requiring inspections or licensing of public lodging establishments, including vacation rentals, or public food service establishments; requires licenses issued by Division of Hotels & Restaurants of DBPR to be displayed conspicuously to public inside licensed establishment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vacation Rentals

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-10 - House - House Regulatory Reform Subcommittee (Y: 10 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-30HouseDied in Ways & Means Committee
2021-03-18HouseAdded to Ways & Means Committee agenda
2021-03-02House1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
2021-03-02House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2021-02-17HouseNow in Ways & Means Committee
2021-02-17HouseReferred to Commerce Committee
2021-02-17HouseReferred to Ways & Means Committee
2021-02-11HouseCS Filed
2021-02-11HouseLaid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
2021-02-11HouseReported out of Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
2021-02-10HouseFavorable with CS by Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
2021-02-03HouseAdded to Regulatory Reform Subcommittee agenda
2021-01-22HouseReferred to Regulatory Reform Subcommittee; Ways and Means Committee; Commerce Committee
2021-01-12HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S522 (Same As) 2021-04-30 - Died in Rules
H1481 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
S1988 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Regulated Industries

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
15927Amended CodeSee Bill Text
21203Amended CodeSee Bill Text
21208Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3161955Amended CodeSee Bill Text
404056Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4770135Amended CodeSee Bill Text
509013Amended CodeSee Bill Text
509032Amended CodeSee Bill Text
509221Amended CodeSee Bill Text
509241Amended CodeSee Bill Text
509243Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5535041Amended CodeSee Bill Text
70517Amended CodeSee Bill Text
705185Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7171355Amended CodeSee Bill Text
77521Amended CodeSee Bill Text
87724Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback