FL H0219 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits sale, transfers, or possession of assault weapon or large-capacity ammunition magazine; provides exceptions; requires certificates of possession for assault weapons or large-capacity ammunition magazines lawfully possessed before specified date; provides conditions for continued possession of such weapons or large-capacity ammunition magazines; requires certificates of transfer for transfers of assault weapons or large-capacity magazines; provides for relinquishment of assault weapons or large-capacity magazines; provides requirements for transportation of assault weapons; provides enhanced criminal penalties for certain offenses when committed with assault weapon or large-capacity magazine.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Assault Weapons and Large-Capacity Magazines

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10HouseDied in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
2018-03-10HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2017-10-12HouseReferred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee
2017-10-03HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

H221 (Related) 2018-03-10 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
S196 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Judiciary

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
775087Amended CodeSee Bill Text
79030Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback