FL H0217 | 2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - Chapter No. 2024-50
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revises authorized uses of revenue from capital improvement fees to include certain college campus facilities & revises number of beds certain FCS institutions may provide to certain persons; revises which funds may be used for construction of dormitories; & requires Division of Bond Finance to conduct analysis of financing before issuance of specified bonds.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

College Campus Facilities in Areas of Critical State Concern

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#26 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#696 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House Appropriations Committee (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - House - House Postsecondary Education & Workforce Subcommittee (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-03 Chapter No. 2024-50
2024-04-02 Approved by Governor
2024-03-27 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2024-03-01HouseOrdered enrolled
2024-03-01HouseIn Messages
2024-03-01SenateCS passed; YEAS 29 NAYS 0
2024-03-01SenateRead 3rd time
2024-03-01SenateRead 2nd time
2024-03-01SenateSubstituted for CS/CS/SB 222
2024-03-01SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2024-03-01SenateWithdrawn from Appropriations
2024-02-28SenateReceived
2024-02-28SenateReferred to Appropriations
2024-02-28SenateIn Messages
2024-02-28HouseCS passed; YEAS 116, NAYS 0
2024-02-28HouseRead 3rd time
2024-02-27HouseAdded to Third Reading Calendar
2024-02-27HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2024-02-27HouseRead 2nd time
2024-02-22HouseBill added to Special Order Calendar (2/27/2024)
2024-02-12HouseAdded to Second Reading Calendar
2024-02-12HouseBill referred to House Calendar
2024-02-12HouseOriginal reference removed: Education & Employment Committee
2024-02-09House1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
2024-02-09HouseCS Filed
2024-02-09HouseLaid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
2024-02-08HouseReported out of Appropriations Committee
2024-02-08HouseFavorable with CS by Appropriations Committee
2024-02-06HouseAdded to Appropriations Committee agenda
2024-01-29House1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
2024-01-29HouseNow in Appropriations Committee
2024-01-29HouseReferred to Education & Employment Committee
2024-01-29HouseReferred to Appropriations Committee
2024-01-26HouseCS Filed
2024-01-26HouseLaid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
2024-01-26HouseReported out of Postsecondary Education & Workforce Subcommittee
2024-01-25HouseFavorable with CS by Postsecondary Education & Workforce Subcommittee
2024-01-23HouseAdded to Postsecondary Education & Workforce Subcommittee agenda
2024-01-09House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2023-11-02HouseNow in Postsecondary Education & Workforce Subcommittee
2023-11-02HouseReferred to Education & Employment Committee
2023-11-02HouseReferred to Postsecondary Education & Workforce Subcommittee
2023-10-18HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S222 (Same As) 2024-03-01 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 217

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100923Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101340Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/217
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/217/BillText/Filed/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/217/BillText/c1/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/217/BillText/c2/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/217/BillText/er/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/217/Amendment/311799/PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/217/Analyses/h0217.PEW.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/217/Analyses/h0217a.PEW.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/217/Analyses/h0217b.APC.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/217/Analyses/h0217c.APC.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/217/Analyses/h0217z.PEW.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/217/Analyses/h0217z1.PEW.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.myfloridahouse.gov/Sections/Committees/billvote.aspx?VoteId=70717&IsPCB=0&BillId=78800
Roll Callhttps://www.myfloridahouse.gov/Sections/Committees/billvote.aspx?VoteId=71718&IsPCB=0&BillId=78800
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/217/Vote/HouseVote_h00217c2696.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/217/Vote/SenateVote_h00217c2026.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback