FL H0217 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates Targeted High Wage Production Program within DEO; provides rebate eligibility requirements & application procedures; requires Commissioner of Film & Entertainment to review applications & take certain actions; requires annual report to Governor & Legislature; provides for expiration of program & reversion of appropriated funds.
Title
Film, Television, and Digital Media Project Rebate Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Died in Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee |
2022-03-12 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-10-22 | House | Now in Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee |
2021-10-22 | House | Referred to Commerce Committee |
2021-10-22 | House | Referred to Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-10-22 | House | Referred to Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee |
2021-09-30 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S946 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Finance and Tax
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/217 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/217/BillText/Filed/PDF |