FL H0215 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on September 30 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-24 - Added to State Affairs Committee agenda
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Hearing: Jan 26 @ 9:00 am House State Affairs Committee Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Provides emergency orders may not directly or indirectly prohibit religious institutions from regular religious services or activities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Emergency Orders Prohibiting Religious Services or Activities

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-01-19 - House - House Pandemics & Public Emergencies Committee (Y: 14 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-24HouseAdded to State Affairs Committee agenda
2022-01-20HouseNow in State Affairs Committee
2022-01-20HouseReferred to Judiciary Committee
2022-01-20HouseReferred to State Affairs Committee
2022-01-19House1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
2022-01-19HouseCS Filed
2022-01-19HouseLaid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
2022-01-19HouseReported out of Pandemics & Public Emergencies Committee
2022-01-19HouseFavorable with CS by Pandemics & Public Emergencies Committee
2022-01-14HouseAdded to Pandemics & Public Emergencies Committee agenda
2022-01-11House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2021-10-22HouseNow in Pandemics & Public Emergencies Committee
2021-10-22HouseReferred to Judiciary Committee
2021-10-22HouseReferred to State Affairs Committee
2021-10-22HouseReferred to Pandemics & Public Emergencies Committee
2021-09-30HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S254 (Same As) 2022-01-24 - Placed on Special Order Calendar, 01/27/22

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
25264Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback