FL H0215 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides that forfeiture is not final & title to property does not pass until specified criteria are met; provides for recovery for damage to seized property; requires issuance of seizure warrant before property may be seized; provides requirements for issuance of such warrant; provides additional requirements for custody of seized property; provides for rights of owners of seized property; provides for expedited recovery of seized property in certain circumstances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Forfeiture of Contraband Articles

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-28HouseDied in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
2015-03-03HouseIntroduced
2015-01-22HouseReferred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; Judiciary Committee
2015-01-08HouseFiled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
32234Amended CodeSee Bill Text
932703Amended CodeSee Bill Text
932704Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9327055Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback