FL H0211 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Professions & Public Health Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Professions & Public Health Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides criminal penalties for health care practitioners who engage in or cause specified practices to be performed on minor under certain conditions.
Title
Youth Gender and Sexual Identity
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Died in Professions & Public Health Subcommittee |
2022-03-12 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-10-06 | House | Now in Professions & Public Health Subcommittee |
2021-10-06 | House | Referred to Health & Human Services Committee |
2021-10-06 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2021-10-06 | House | Referred to Professions & Public Health Subcommittee |
2021-09-29 | House | Filed |
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/211 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/211/BillText/Filed/PDF |