FL H0209 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on September 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-09 - Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) SB 1084 passed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits discrimination in housing provided to person with disability who has emotional support animal; prohibits housing provider from requiring such person to pay extra compensation; authorizes housing provider to request certain information; specifies person with disability is liable for damage done by emotional support animal; prohibits health care practitioner from providing information for emotional support animal without personal knowledge of person's need for animal; prohibits falsification of written documentation or other misrepresentation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Emotional Support Animals

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-09HouseLaid on Table - Companion bill(s) SB 1084 passed
2020-02-19HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-18HouseCS/CS/CS by Judiciary Committee read 1st time
2020-02-18HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2020-02-12HouseCS/CS/CS by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
2020-02-10HouseOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 02/12/20, 10:00 am, Sumner Hall
2020-01-28HouseOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 01/30/20, 8:00 am, Sumner Hall --Temporarily Postponed
2020-01-21HouseNow in Judiciary Committee
2020-01-17HouseCS/CS by Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee read 1st time
2020-01-17HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2020-01-16HouseCS/CS by Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0
2020-01-14HouseCS by Civil Justice Subcommittee read 1st time
2020-01-14HouseIntroduced
2020-01-14HouseOn Committee agenda-- Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee, 01/16/20, 9:00 am, 12 HOB
2019-11-25HouseNow in Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee
2019-11-18HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-11-14HouseCS by Civil Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
2019-11-07HouseOn Committee agenda-- Civil Justice Subcommittee, 11/14/19, 9:00 am, Sumner Hall
2019-10-10HouseReferred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee
2019-09-20HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

H49 (Similar To) 2019-08-12 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
S1084 (Similar To) 2020-06-24 - Chapter No. 2020-76

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
41308Amended CodeSee Bill Text
419001Amended CodeSee Bill Text
456072Amended CodeSee Bill Text
76022Amended CodeSee Bill Text
76023Amended CodeSee Bill Text
76024Amended CodeSee Bill Text
76025Amended CodeSee Bill Text
76027Amended CodeSee Bill Text
76029Amended CodeSee Bill Text
76031Amended CodeSee Bill Text
817265Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback