FL H0209 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Ratifies proposed amendment to U.S. Constitution relating to equal rights for men & women.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Equal Rights for Men and Women

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03HouseDied in Civil Justice Subcommittee
2019-05-03HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-01-16HouseReferred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee
2019-01-09HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S266 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Judiciary
H255 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback