FL H0207 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Agriculture and Property Rights Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires local governments to address protection of private property rights in their comprehensive plans; requires comprehensive plan to include private property rights element; requires counties & municipalities to adopt or amend land development regulations consistent with private property rights element; provides deadlines; requires state land planning agency to approve private property rights element if it is substantially in specified form.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Growth Management

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10HouseDied in Agriculture and Property Rights Subcommittee
2018-03-10HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2017-10-12HouseReferred to Agriculture and Property Rights Subcommittee; Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; Commerce Committee
2017-09-28HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S362 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Community Affairs

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1633167Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1633177Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback