FL H0205 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-2-2)
Status: Passed on June 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-24 - Chapter No. 2020-82
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits certain misrepresentations concerning military service when made for specified purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Unlawful Use of Uniforms, Medals, or Insignia

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#11 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#416 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-24 Chapter No. 2020-82
2020-06-23 Approved by Governor
2020-06-16 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2020-03-05HouseOrdered enrolled
2020-03-05SenateCS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0
2020-03-05SenateRead 3rd time
2020-03-04SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2020-03-04SenateRead 2nd time
2020-03-04SenateSubstituted for CS/SB 352
2020-03-04SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2020-03-04SenateWithdrawn from Military and Veterans Affairs and Space; Ethics and Elections; Rules
2020-02-13SenateReceived
2020-02-13SenateReferred to Military and Veterans Affairs and Space; Ethics and Elections; Rules
2020-02-12SenateIn Messages
2020-02-05HouseCS passed; YEAS 116 NAYS 0
2020-02-05HouseRead 3rd time
2020-02-05HouseRead 2nd time
2020-01-30HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 02/05/20
2020-01-23HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-01-23HouseFavorable by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 24 NAYS 0
2020-01-21HouseOn Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 01/23/20, 9:30 am, Morris Hall
2020-01-20HouseNow in State Affairs Committee
2020-01-16HouseCS/CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee read 1st time
2020-01-16HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2020-01-15HouseCS/CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0
2020-01-14HouseCS by Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee read 1st time
2020-01-14HouseIntroduced
2020-01-13HouseOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice Subcommittee, 01/15/20, 9:30 am, Sumner Hall
2019-11-07HouseNow in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
2019-11-06HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-11-06HouseCS by Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2019-10-30HouseOn Committee agenda-- Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee, 11/06/19, 9:30 am, 12 HOB
2019-10-10HouseReferred to Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; Criminal Justice Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee
2019-09-19HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S352 (Same As) 2020-03-04 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 205

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
817312Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback