FL H0197 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits concealed weapon or firearm licensee from openly carrying handgun or carrying concealed weapon or firearm into any child care facility.
Title
Concealed Weapons and Firearms
Sponsors
Rep. Cindy Polo [D] | Rep. John Cortes [D] | Rep. Javier Fernandez [D] | Rep. Joseph Geller [D] |
Rep. Dotie Joseph [D] | Rep. Amy Mercado [D] | Rep. Carlos Smith [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | House | Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2019-05-03 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-01-16 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2019-01-09 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S752 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Judiciary
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/197 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/197/BillText/Filed/PDF |