FL H0195 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-07 - Now in PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee
Pending: House Prek-12 Appropriations Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires each school district to offer specified courses relating to religion, Hebrew Scriptures, & Bible to certain students as elective courses; provides course requirements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Study of the Bible and Religion

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-07HouseNow in PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee
2019-03-07HouseFavorable by PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 3
2019-03-05HouseOn Committee agenda-- PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee, 03/07/19, 9:00 am, Webster Hall
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-01-16HouseReferred to PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee; PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee
2019-01-09HouseFiled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100345Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback