FL H0193 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides early education or child care subsidy for certain foster parents.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Child Care Subsidies for Foster Parents

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14HouseDied in Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee
2020-03-14HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-01-14HouseIntroduced
2019-09-25HouseReferred to Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee
2019-09-18HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S354 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
409145Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback