FL H0191 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Creates Florida Young Farmers & Ranchers Matching Grant Program within DACS; provides requirements for recipient eligibility & grant awards; specifies that grant funding is contingent upon specific legislative appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Young Farmers and Ranchers

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14HouseDied in Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee
2020-03-14HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-01-14HouseIntroduced
2019-09-25HouseReferred to Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee; Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee
2019-09-17HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1130 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
570842Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback