FL H0191 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Workforce Development and Tourism Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Creates Northwest Florida Rural Inland Affected Counties Recovery Fund within DEO; requires certain payments to be appropriated annually to fund; requires DEO to grant awards to organizations & local governments for specified infrastructure projects & workforce programs; requires DEO to establish application procedure & prioritize projects & programs that meet certain requirements; requires DEO, in consultation with specified entities, to review & certify applications; exempts certain funds from reversion.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Northwest Florida Rural Inland Affected Counties Recovery Fund

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03HouseDied in Workforce Development and Tourism Subcommittee
2019-05-03HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-01-16HouseReferred to Workforce Development and Tourism Subcommittee; Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; Commerce Committee
2019-01-09HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1162 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2888055Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback