FL H0191 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-2)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits transfer of certain funds under specified conditions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Housing Trust Fund

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10HouseDied in Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
2018-03-10HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2017-10-03HouseReferred to Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee
2017-09-26HouseFiled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4200005Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4209079Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback