FL H0191 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on October 17 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-28 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 17 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-28 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Delays implementation of personnel evaluation procedures conducted for purposes of awarding contracts & providing performance pay.
Title
Public School Personnel Evaluation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-28 | House | Withdrawn prior to introduction |
2014-02-28 | House | Withdrawn from K-12 Subcommittee; Education Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee; Appropriations Committee |
2013-11-22 | House | Referred to K-12 Subcommittee; Education Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee; Appropriations Committee |
2013-10-17 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0468 (Same As) 2014-05-02 - Died in Education
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/191 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/0191/BillText/Filed/PDF |