FL H0189 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits person from committing certain acts against reproductive health services clients, providers, or assistants; prohibits person from damaging certain properties; provides penalties & requirements for departures from sentences & fines; provides civil remedies for those aggrieved by specified violations against reproductive health services clients, providers, or assistants or against certain properties; authorizes civil actions for such violations; requires court to take actions necessary to safeguard health, safety, or privacy of certain people & entities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Access to Clinics

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10HouseDied in Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee
2018-03-10HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2017-10-03HouseReferred to Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee
2017-09-26HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S320 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in Criminal Justice

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
76201Amended CodeSee Bill Text
76202Amended CodeSee Bill Text
76203Amended CodeSee Bill Text
76204Amended CodeSee Bill Text
76205Amended CodeSee Bill Text
76206Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback