FL H0189 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-17 - Chapter No. 2015-167
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revises definition of term "asset" to include Florida Insurance Guaranty Association assessments for purposes of determining financial condition of insurer; transfers provision relating to obligation of Florida Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association to pay valid claims.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Insurance Guaranty Associations

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#11 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#24 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-17 Chapter No. 2015-167
2015-06-16 Approved by Governor
2015-06-01 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2015-04-24HouseOrdered enrolled
2015-04-24SenateCS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0
2015-04-24SenateRead 3rd time
2015-04-23SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2015-04-23SenateRead 2nd time
2015-04-23SenateSubstituted for CS/CS/SB 600
2015-04-23SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2015-04-23SenateWithdrawn from Banking and Insurance; Commerce and Tourism; Fiscal Policy
2015-03-31SenateReceived
2015-03-27SenateReferred to Banking and Insurance; Commerce and Tourism; Fiscal Policy
2015-03-26SenateIn Messages
2015-03-18HouseCS passed; YEAS 117 NAYS 0
2015-03-18HouseRead 3rd time
2015-03-17HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2015-03-17HouseRead 2nd time
2015-03-13HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/17/15
2015-03-05HousePlaced on Calendar
2015-03-05HouseFavorable by- Regulatory Affairs Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
2015-03-03HouseCS by Finance and Tax Committee read 1st time
2015-03-03HouseOn Committee agenda-- Regulatory Affairs Committee, 03/05/15, 8:30 am, Sumner Hall
2015-03-03HouseIntroduced
2015-02-24HouseNow in Regulatory Affairs Committee
2015-02-23HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c)
2015-02-19HouseCS by Finance and Tax Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
2015-02-12HouseOn Committee agenda-- Finance and Tax Committee, 02/19/15, 10:30 am, Morris Hall
2015-02-04HouseNow in Finance and Tax Committee
2015-02-04HouseFavorable by Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
2015-01-28HouseOn Committee agenda-- Insurance and Banking Subcommittee, 02/04/15, 1:30 pm, Sumner Hall
2015-01-15HouseReferred to Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; Finance and Tax Committee; Regulatory Affairs Committee
2015-01-07HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S0600 (Similar To) 2015-04-23 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 189 (Ch. 2015-167)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
625012Amended CodeSee Bill Text
631717Amended CodeSee Bill Text
631737Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback