FL H0189 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Calculates school district's class size categorical allocation reduction at school average when maximum class size requirements are not met.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maximum Class Size

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-03HouseDied on Calendar
2013-03-27HousePlaced on Calendar
2013-03-27HouseFavorable by- Education Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 1
2013-03-25HouseOn Committee agenda-- Education Committee, 03/27/13, 1:00 pm, Reed Hall
2013-03-12HouseNow in Education Committee
2013-03-12HouseFavorable by Education Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
2013-03-08HouseOn Committee agenda-- Education Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/12/13, 9:00 am, Morris Hall
2013-03-05HouseCS by Choice and Innovation Subcommittee read 1st time
2013-03-05HouseIntroduced
2013-02-25HouseNow in Education Appropriations Subcommittee
2013-02-21HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c)
2013-02-20HouseCS by Choice and Innovation Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 1
2013-02-13HousePCS on Committee agenda-- Choice and Innovation Subcommittee, 02/20/13, 9:00 am, 306 HOB
2013-01-23HouseReferred to Choice and Innovation Subcommittee; Education Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee
2013-01-16HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1370 (Same As) 2013-05-03 - Died in Education
S0826 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Education

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100233Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100303Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback