FL H0187 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits local law enforcement agencies from acquiring certain surplus military equipment; prohibits use of certain munitions & tear gas; provides exceptions.
Title
Law Enforcement Equipment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | House | Died in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-01-22 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2021-01-08 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S878 (Same As) 2021-04-30 - Died in Community Affairs
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/187 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/187/BillText/Filed/PDF |