FL H0185 | 2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on October 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-05 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/CS/SB 1224
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Revises laws relating to dependent children including requiring GAL for each child; authorizes GALs to represent child in other proceedings; access records, request continuances, & receive notices; provides duties & responsibilities of GALs; requiring Statewide Guardian ad Litem Office to provide oversight & assistance to attorneys ad litem, & assist child find supportive adult; requires Office of Continuing Care to work in coordination with Statewide Guardian ad Litem Office; authorizes Fostering Prosperity program to provide grants.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Dependent Children

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-02-22 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House Appropriations Committee (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-12-05 - House - House Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-03-05HouseLaid on Table, refer to CS/CS/CS/SB 1224
2024-03-01HouseAdded to Second Reading Calendar
2024-03-01HouseTemporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading
2024-02-27HouseBill added to Special Order Calendar (3/1/2024)
2024-02-22HouseAdded to Second Reading Calendar
2024-02-22HouseBill released to House Calendar
2024-02-22HouseReported out of Health & Human Services Committee
2024-02-22HouseFavorable by Health & Human Services Committee
2024-02-20HouseAdded to Health & Human Services Committee agenda
2024-02-12HouseNow in Health & Human Services Committee
2024-02-12HouseReferred to Health & Human Services Committee
2024-02-09House1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
2024-02-09HouseCS Filed
2024-02-09HouseLaid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
2024-02-08HouseReported out of Appropriations Committee
2024-02-08HouseFavorable with CS by Appropriations Committee
2024-02-06HouseAdded to Appropriations Committee agenda
2024-01-09House1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
2024-01-09House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2023-12-18HouseNow in Appropriations Committee
2023-12-18HouseReferred to Health & Human Services Committee
2023-12-18HouseReferred to Appropriations Committee
2023-12-18HouseOriginal reference removed: Civil Justice Subcommittee
2023-12-08HouseCS Filed
2023-12-08HouseLaid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
2023-12-08HouseReported out of Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee
2023-12-05HouseFavorable with CS by Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee
2023-11-28HouseAdded to Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee agenda
2023-11-02HouseNow in Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee
2023-11-02HouseReferred to Health & Human Services Committee
2023-11-02HouseReferred to Civil Justice Subcommittee
2023-11-02HouseReferred to Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee
2023-10-16HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1224 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Chapter No. 2024-70

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1009898Amended CodeSee Bill Text
110205Amended CodeSee Bill Text
119071Amended CodeSee Bill Text
29008Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32008058Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32209Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39001Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3900145Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3900146Amended CodeSee Bill Text
390016Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3901Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39013Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3901305Amended CodeSee Bill Text
390132Amended CodeSee Bill Text
390136Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3901375Amended CodeSee Bill Text
390139Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39202Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39302Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39402Amended CodeSee Bill Text
394022Amended CodeSee Bill Text
394023Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39407Amended CodeSee Bill Text
394085Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39502Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39521Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39522Amended CodeSee Bill Text
396011Amended CodeSee Bill Text
396012Amended CodeSee Bill Text
396036Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39621Amended CodeSee Bill Text
396241Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39701Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39801Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39807Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39808Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39815Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39820Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39821Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39822Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39827Amended CodeSee Bill Text
398296Amended CodeSee Bill Text
398297Amended CodeSee Bill Text
394495Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4024Amended CodeSee Bill Text
41456Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4316Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6113Amended CodeSee Bill Text
61402Amended CodeSee Bill Text
627746Amended CodeSee Bill Text
934255Amended CodeSee Bill Text
943053Amended CodeSee Bill Text
960065Amended CodeSee Bill Text
98543Amended CodeSee Bill Text
985441Amended CodeSee Bill Text
985455Amended CodeSee Bill Text
985461Amended CodeSee Bill Text
98548Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/185
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/185/BillText/Filed/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/185/BillText/c1/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/185/BillText/c2/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/185/Amendment/687997/PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/185/Analyses/h0185.CFS.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/185/Analyses/h0185a.CFS.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/185/Analyses/h0185b.APC.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/185/Analyses/h0185c.APC.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/185/Analyses/h0185d.HHS.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/185/Analyses/h0185e.HHS.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/185/Analyses/h0185z.CFS.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/185/Analyses/h0185z1.CFS.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.myfloridahouse.gov/Sections/Committees/billvote.aspx?VoteId=69628&IsPCB=0&BillId=78781
Roll Callhttps://www.myfloridahouse.gov/Sections/Committees/billvote.aspx?VoteId=71713&IsPCB=0&BillId=78781
Roll Callhttps://www.myfloridahouse.gov/Sections/Committees/billvote.aspx?VoteId=72274&IsPCB=0&BillId=78781

Bill Comments

feedback