FL H0185 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-02 - Chapter No. 2018-129
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for allocation of fees from certain driver license examinations administered by tax collectors & certain driver license reinstatement services performed by tax collectors.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Redirection of Fees to Tax Collectors

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#22 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#521 (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-02 Chapter No. 2018-129
2018-03-30 Approved by Governor
2018-03-26 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2018-03-08HouseOrdered enrolled
2018-03-08SenatePassed; YEAS 36 NAYS 0
2018-03-08SenateRead 3rd time
2018-03-07SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-03-07SenateRead 2nd time
2018-03-07SenateSubstituted for SB 322
2018-03-07SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-03-07SenateWithdrawn from Transportation; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations
2018-02-01SenateReceived
2018-02-01SenateReferred to Transportation; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations
2018-01-31SenateIn Messages
2018-01-25HousePassed; YEAS 107 NAYS 0
2018-01-25HouseRead 3rd time
2018-01-24HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-01-24HouseRead 2nd time
2018-01-18HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 01/24/18
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2017-11-08HousePlaced on Calendar
2017-11-07HouseFavorable by- Government Accountability Committee; YEAS 23 NAYS 0
2017-10-31HouseOn Committee agenda-- Government Accountability Committee, 11/07/17, 1:30 pm, Morris Hall
2017-10-03HouseReferred to Government Accountability Committee
2017-09-25HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S322 (Same As) 2018-03-07 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 185

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
32212Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32221Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback