FL H0183 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires public schools to create Staff Assistance for Emergencies (SAFE) Team & school elopement plan; provides requirements for team & plan; requires & provides requirements for elopement quick reference guides for certain students; requires public schools to annually submit their plans to district school board.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Student Elopement

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03HouseDied in PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee
2019-05-03HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-01-16HouseReferred to PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee; PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee
2019-01-08HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1736 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Education

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1003211Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback