FL H0179 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-5)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires DCF to establish Florida Veterans' Care Coordination Program to provide certain services to veterans & their families; requires DCF to contract with managing entities to enter into agreements with Florida 211 Network participants; requires statewide delivery of services; requires collection of program implementation data & submission of data to DCF; provides appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Services for Veterans and Their Families

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10HouseDied in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
2018-03-10HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2017-11-16HouseNow in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
2017-11-16HouseFavorable by Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
2017-11-09HouseOn Committee agenda-- Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee, 11/16/17, 9:00 am, 12 HOB
2017-10-03HouseReferred to Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee
2017-09-22HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S326 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3949087Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback