FL H0177 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Designates act "Economic Redemption and Restoration of Constitutional Rights Act"; authorizes person suffering from legal disability due to criminal conviction to apply for relief; provides exceptions.
Title
Restoration of Rights
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | House | Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2019-05-03 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-01-16 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2019-01-07 | House | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
944 | 292 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
944 | 2925 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/177 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/177/BillText/Filed/PDF |